AZ HB2031 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; individuals with disabilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; individuals with disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-01-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-12HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-11HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2022-01-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2022-01-03HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback