AZ HB2030 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance coverage; telemedicine; urology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance coverage; telemedicine; urology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Health Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-22SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-11HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-10HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-05HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201057.13Amended CodeSee Bill Text
201376.05Amended CodeSee Bill Text
201406.05Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20841.09Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68462
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2030p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2030h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2030barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2030hhs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68462&billStatusActionId=175345&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68462&billStatusActionId=175251&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68462&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback