AZ HB2029 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Griffin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2029. Passed by vv.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-14 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Griffin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2029. Passed by vv.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Groundwater model; unpledged effluent
Title
Groundwater model; unpledged effluent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Griffin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2029. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Griffin to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2029. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Griffin to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2029. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Griffin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2029. Passed by vv. |
2024-02-29 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefile |