AZ HB2027 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; unfunded liability; CORP

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; unfunded liability; CORP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/ONLY) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-0-0)
2023-03-20SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2023-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0)
2023-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-08HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-3-3-0-0-0)
2023-02-01HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-2-0-0-0)
2023-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2023-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-17HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2023-01-17HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2023-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38915Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78104
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2027p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2027h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.2027LIVINGSTON.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.2027APPROPRIATIONS.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/S.2027MESNARD.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/S.2027FIN.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502058
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502352
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503757
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504220
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506071
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508757
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78104&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78104&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78104&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78104&billStatusActionId=215993&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78104&billStatusActionId=216057&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78104&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78104&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4

Bill Comments

feedback