AZ HB2027 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alternative fuel special plates; veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative fuel special plates; veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 131
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-03HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-12-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282416Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69664
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2027p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2027h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0131.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69664&billStatusActionId=180506&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69664&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69664&billStatusActionId=182716&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69664&billStatusActionId=182879&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback