AZ HB2026 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Residential lease community; water; certificate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential lease community; water; certificate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2024-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2024-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2024-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2024-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2024-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (49-8-2-0)
2024-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2024-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2024-02-13HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2024-01-09HouseHouse read second time
2024-01-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2024-01-08HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2024-01-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-12-06HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
322101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45576Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483772Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483774.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483779Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79778
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2026p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2026h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/proposed/H.2026GRIFFIN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/adopted/H.2026NATURAL RESOURCES ENERGY WATER.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/514123
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/514946
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/515973
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79778&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79778&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79778&billStatusActionId=224097&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79778&billStatusActionId=224283&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback