AZ HB2026 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (22-36-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (22-36-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tax exemption; single family dwellings
Title
Tax exemption; single family dwellings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (22-36-2-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |