AZ HB2024 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alkaline hydrolysis; facilities; operators; licensure
Title
Alkaline hydrolysis; facilities; operators; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 257 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-3-4-0) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-2-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-8-1-0) |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Alkaline Hydrolysis
Counties - Title 11
Facilities
Licensure
Operators
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Funeral Directors And Embalmers
Counties - Title 11
Facilities
Licensure
Operators
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Funeral Directors And Embalmers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 594 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1366 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1372 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1373 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1399 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |