AZ HB2024 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Immigration laws; attorney fees
Title
Immigration laws; attorney fees
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House FSR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |