AZ HB2019 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

CTEDs; district governing boards; elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CTEDs; district governing boards; elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateChapter 252
2021-04-20SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-14HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0)
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-23SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
2021-03-16SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-15SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-03-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-01-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-12HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-11HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-12-21HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15425.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74302
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2019p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2019h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0252.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/479934
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480265
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481830
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487562
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488939
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74302&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74302&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74302&billStatusActionId=198566&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74302&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74302&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74302&billStatusActionId=203676&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74302&billStatusActionId=203695&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback