AZ HB2019 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

CTEDs; nonprofits; postsecondary institutions; agreements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CTEDs; nonprofits; postsecondary institutions; agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-10SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2020-03-02SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-10HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0-0)
2020-01-16HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-11-19HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15393Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback