AZ HB2019 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House TRANS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Highway safety fee; repeal; VLT..

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway safety fee; repeal; VLT..

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-12-26HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282007Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
285805Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
411752Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback