AZ HB2019 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights advisory board; continuation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights advisory board; continuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateChapter 4
2018-03-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-13HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-01-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-01-24HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-29HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413018.11Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
413026.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69632
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2019p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2019h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0004.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69632&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69632&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69632&billStatusActionId=180190&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69632&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69632&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69632&billStatusActionId=182453&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback