AZ HB2019 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Credited service; military service purchase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credited service; military service purchase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05 Chapter 90
2016-04-05 Governor Signed
2016-03-30 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-28SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
2016-03-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-02SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-1-0)
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Senate FIN Committee
2016-02-24SenateSenate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0)
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate PSMT Committee
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-08HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2016-02-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-01-11HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-01-21HouseHouse GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-01-12HouseReferred to House GHE Committee
2016-01-12HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-11HouseAssigned to House GHE Committee
2016-01-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback