AZ HB2019 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Legislators; voting required; salary loss.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislators; voting required; salary loss.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-01 House majority caucus: Do pass
2010-03-01 House minority caucus: Do pass
2010-03-01 House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-1-0-1-0)
2010-01-11 Referred to House RULES Committee
2010-01-19 House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0)
2010-01-12 Referred to House GOV Committee
2010-01-12 House read second time
2010-01-11 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2010-01-11 Assigned to House GOV Committee
2010-01-11 Introduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback