AZ HB2015 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - House third reading PASSED voting: (42-17-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; preschool development grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; preschool development grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (42-17-1-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-19HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
2021-01-13HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-12HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-01-12HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-12-17HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74297
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2015p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2015h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480592
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480644
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480954
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485499
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74297&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74297&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74297&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74297&billStatusActionId=201719&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback