AZ HB2007 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Evasion; crime; personal disguises

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evasion; crime; personal disguises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateChapter 61
2018-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-19HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-08SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-16SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse JPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-21HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
132925New CodeSee Bill Text
13701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69619
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2007p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2007h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0061.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2007farnsworth e1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2007judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69619&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69619&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69619&billStatusActionId=180918&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69619&billStatusActionId=180935&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69619&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69619&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69619&billStatusActionId=182552&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback