AZ HB2005 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Political subdivision entities; public access

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political subdivision entities; public access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2013-02-19SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-04SenateSenate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2013-02-20SenateReferred to Senate GE Committee
2013-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2013-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2013-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate GE Committee
2013-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2013-02-13HouseTransmit to Senate
2013-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-6-1-0)
2013-02-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2013-02-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2013-01-14HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-01-22HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2013-01-15HouseReferred to House GOV Committee
2013-01-15HouseHouse read second time
2013-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-01-14HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2013-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback