AZ HB2004 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

ASRS; waiting period; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASRS; waiting period; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16 Governor Vetoed
2018-05-03 Transmitted to Governor
2018-05-03HouseTransmit to House
2018-05-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-01-29SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-01-29HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-01-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-11HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-11-16HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38671Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69615
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2004p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2004h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69615&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69615&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69615&billStatusActionId=179748&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69615&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69615&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69615&billStatusActionId=183626&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69615&billStatusActionId=183722&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback