AZ HB2003 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Replacement lines; structures; commission hearings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Replacement lines; structures; commission hearings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21SenateChapter 248
2024-06-21SenateGovernor Signed
2024-06-15SenateTransmitted to Governor
2024-06-12HouseTransmit to House
2024-06-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-9-3-0)
2024-04-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2024-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2024-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2024-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2024-03-21SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2024-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2024-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2024-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2024-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2024-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2024-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-1-0)
2024-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-01-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2024-01-30HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2024-01-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0)
2024-01-23HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2024-01-09HouseHouse read second time
2024-01-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2024-01-08HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2024-01-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-11-20HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40360.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79755
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2003p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2003h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/laws/0248.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/proposed/H.2003GRIFFIN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/adopted/H.2003NATURAL RESOURCES ENERGY WATER.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/proposed/S.20030912.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/511282
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/512248
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/515563
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/517743
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/520239
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79755&billStatusActionId=223599&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79755&billStatusActionId=224595&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79755&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79755&billStatusActionId=226983&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79755&billStatusActionId=227178&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback