AZ HB2003 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 7th Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2010-2011

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2010-2011

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Governor Signed
2010-03-15 Transmitted to Governor
2010-03-12 Transmit to House
2010-03-11 Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2010-03-08 Referred to Senate Committee
2010-03-09 Referred to Senate Committee
2010-03-11 Introduced in Senate and read first time
2010-03-11 Transmit to Senate
2010-03-11 House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-0-0)
2010-03-11 House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2010-03-09 House majority caucus: Do pass
2010-03-09 House minority caucus: Do pass
2010-03-09 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2010-03-08 Referred to House RULES Committee
2010-03-09 House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0)
2010-03-09 Referred to House APPROP Committee
2010-03-09 House read second time
2010-03-08 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2010-03-08 Assigned to House APPROP Committee
2010-03-08 Introduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback