AR SR9 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill Concerning Security Licensing; School Security; The Arkansas Board Of Private Investigators And Private Security Agencies; And The Transfer Of Powers And Duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill Concerning Security Licensing; School Security; The Arkansas Board Of Private Investigators And Private Security Agencies; And The Transfer Of Powers And Duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - Senate - Failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Failed of adoption. (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-19SenateSine Die adjournment
2014-03-19SenateDied in the Senate having Failed of Adoption
2014-02-26SenateFailed of adoption.
2014-02-13SenateThe vote by which SR 9 failed on Feb 11 was expunged
2014-02-11SenateFailed of adoption.
2014-02-11SenateRules suspended.
2014-02-10SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2014-02-10SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback