AR SR18 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify Gun Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify Gun Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2019-03-26SenateRoll Call Requested
2019-03-26SenateRead Third Time
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback