AR SR17 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The North Little Rock Boys Basketball Team As The Class 6a State Champions.
Title
To Recognize The North Little Rock Boys Basketball Team As The Class 6a State Champions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed |