AR SR10 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Commending The Arkansas Chapter Of The Alzheimer's Association And Proclaiming February 26, 2019, As Alzheimer's Awareness Day.
Title
Commending The Arkansas Chapter Of The Alzheimer's Association And Proclaiming February 26, 2019, As Alzheimer's Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR10 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SR10.pdf |