AR SJR9 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Propose An Amendment To The United States Constitution Providing That Every Human Being Is Entitled To The Right To Life.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Propose An Amendment To The United States Constitution Providing That Every Human Being Is Entitled To The Right To Life.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Read the third time and failed of adoption (Y: 29 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - The motion to suspend the rules to consider SJR 9 FAILED. (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Read the third time and failed of adoption (Y: 29 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - The motion to suspend the rules to consider SJR 9 FAILED. (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned from the house as CONCURRED IN as AMENDED. |
2017-03-28 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-20 | House | The vote by which SJR9 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to reconsider by Rep. Rye SJR9 Failed |
2017-03-14 | House | Read the third time and failed of adoption |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The motion to suspend the rules to consider SJR 9 FAILED. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | The vote by which SJR 9 FAILED, was EXPUNGED. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed |