AR SJR5 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Elected County Officials.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Elected County Officials.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SJR5 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SJR5.pdf |