AR SJR4 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
Pending: Senate State Agencies & Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Requirements Governing Circulation, Submission, And Challenges To The Sufficiency Of Initiatives And Constitutional Amendments Proposed By The General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Requirements Governing Circulation, Submission, And Challenges To The Sufficiency Of Initiatives And Constitutional Amendments Proposed By The General Assembly.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18SenateAmendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2019-03-05SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-05SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-26SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-26SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback