AR SJR2 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
A Constitutional Amendment To Create A Procedure For The Recall Of Certain Elected Officials.
Title
A Constitutional Amendment To Create A Procedure For The Recall Of Certain Elected Officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-02-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed |