AR SJR2 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Read the third time and failed.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Applying To The United States Congress To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applying To The United States Congress To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 41 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-03-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-03-21SenateRead the third time and adopted.
2017-03-07SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-01SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-03-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-01SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-01-30SenateEXPUNGED
2017-01-30SenateRead the third time and failed.
2017-01-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-01-26SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-01-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-26SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2016-12-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback