AR SJR2 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Term Limits For Members Of The General Assembly.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Term Limits For Members Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SJR2 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SJR2.pdf |