AR SB993 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Election Violations By County Boards Of Election Commissioners; And To Require Reporting Of Certain Irregularities.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Election Violations By County Boards Of Election Commissioners; And To Require Reporting Of Certain Irregularities.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |