AR SB984 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB984 is now Act 1504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Sex Offenders From Providing Services Through The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Sex Offenders From Providing Services Through The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB984 is now Act 1504
2013-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback