AR SB978 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that SB978 is now Act 1235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Regulate Vapor Products, Alternative Nicotine Products, And E-liquid Products; To Amend Certain Laws Concerning The Regulation Of Tobacco Products; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate Vapor Products, Alternative Nicotine Products, And E-liquid Products; To Amend Certain Laws Concerning The Regulation Of Tobacco Products; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-08SenateNotification that SB978 is now Act 1235
2015-04-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2015-04-01SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2015-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2015-03-31SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2015-03-31SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2015-03-31HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2015-03-31HouseEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2015-03-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-30HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2015-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2015-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-25SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-25SenateEXPUNGED
2015-03-25SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2015-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-25SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-24SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2015-03-09SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB978
Texthttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SB978.pdf
Texthttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Acts/Act1235.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1284&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1287&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1286&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1856&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1858&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1622&votechamber=Senate

Bill Comments

feedback