AR SB963 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Act To Amend The Law Concerning Complaints Filed With And Investigations Performed By The State Board Of Election Commissioners; And To Amend The Law Concerning Criminal Investigations Of Violations Of Election Laws.
Title
Act To Amend The Law Concerning Complaints Filed With And Investigations Performed By The State Board Of Election Commissioners; And To Amend The Law Concerning Criminal Investigations Of Violations Of Election Laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The vote by which SB 963 passed was EXPUNGED. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |