AR SB96 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-11 - Notification that SB96 is now Act 68
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-11 - Notification that SB96 is now Act 68
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Fee For Transcripts From The Circuit Court Clerk.
Title
To Clarify The Fee For Transcripts From The Circuit Court Clerk.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Woods [R] | Rep. Micah Neal [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | Senate | Notification that SB96 is now Act 68 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-02-07 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-31 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Filed |