AR SB946 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB946 is now Act 1503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Study The Development And Implementation Of A Public Website Containing Information On Persons Convicted Of A Crime Pertaining To Child Abuse And Neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Study The Development And Implementation Of A Public Website Containing Information On Persons Convicted Of A Crime Pertaining To Child Abuse And Neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB946 is now Act 1503
2013-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-12HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-12SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-11SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-11SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-10SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-04-02SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback