AR SB940 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB940 is now Act 1417
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Licensing Of The State Board Of Barber Examiners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Licensing Of The State Board Of Barber Examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB940 is now Act 1417
2013-04-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-17SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-17SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-17HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-16HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-05SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback