AR SB926 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB926 is now Act 1168
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB926 is now Act 1168
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A State Broadband Manager To Promote, Develop, And Coordinate Broadband Expansion And Appropriate Broadband Infrastructure For All Areas Of The State.
Title
To Create A State Broadband Manager To Promote, Develop, And Coordinate Broadband Expansion And Appropriate Broadband Infrastructure For All Areas Of The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB926 is now Act 1168 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE |
2013-04-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | withdraw amendment 1 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |