AR SB914 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB914 is now Act 1499
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Office Of The Medicaid Inspector General And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Office Of The Medicaid Inspector General And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB914 is now Act 1499
2013-04-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-17SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-17SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-17SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2013-04-16SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2013-04-11SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2013-04-11SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-11HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-11HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-10HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2013-04-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-25SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2013-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-25SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2013-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2013-03-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback