AR SB901 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate Fees, Compensation, And Royalties Received From Submerged Lands.
Title
To Regulate Fees, Compensation, And Royalties Received From Submerged Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |