AR SB896 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB896 is now Act 1390
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide For The Ability Of A Church That Operates A Private School, K-12, To Allow A Person Who Possesses A Concealed Handgun License To Carry A Concealed Handgun On School Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide For The Ability Of A Church That Operates A Private School, K-12, To Allow A Person Who Possesses A Concealed Handgun License To Carry A Concealed Handgun On School Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB896 is now Act 1390
2013-04-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-12SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-12SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-12HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback