AR SB880 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that SB880 is now Act 1222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Enhance The Emergency Services Of First Responders; To Create The Naloxone Access Act; And To Provide Immunity For Prescribing, Dispensing, And Administering Naloxone And Other Opioid Antagonists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Enhance The Emergency Services Of First Responders; To Create The Naloxone Access Act; And To Provide Immunity For Prescribing, Dispensing, And Administering Naloxone And Other Opioid Antagonists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-08SenateNotification that SB880 is now Act 1222
2015-04-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-03-31SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-03-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-31SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-31SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2015-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-30SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2015-03-27SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-03-27SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2015-03-27HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2015-03-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-25HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-03-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-03-24HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2015-03-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-12SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-12SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-03-09SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback