AR SB869 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB869 is now Act 1257
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB869 is now Act 1257
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide A Safe Harbor For Victims Of Certain Sex Trafficking And Commercial Sex Offenses.
Title
To Provide A Safe Harbor For Victims Of Certain Sex Trafficking And Commercial Sex Offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Elliott [D] | Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Rep. David Meeks [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Sen. Jason Rapert [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Notification that SB869 is now Act 1257 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |