AR SB861 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB861 is now Act 1502
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

The Annexation And Detachment Transparency Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Annexation And Detachment Transparency Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB861 is now Act 1502
2013-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-19SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2013-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-09SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-09HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-25SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-03-21SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2013-03-18SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
2013-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
2013-03-07SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback