AR SB860 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB860 is now Act 1415
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Sanctions Administered To A Parole Violator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Sanctions Administered To A Parole Violator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB860 is now Act 1415
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-18SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-18SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2013-04-18SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2013-04-17SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-17SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-17HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-16HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-11HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-04-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-07SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback