AR SB859 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB859 is now Act 1273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Of Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Provisional Positions For Institutions Of Higher Education; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Of Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Provisional Positions For Institutions Of Higher Education; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Motion to reconsider SB859 passed. (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 32 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09SenateNotification that SB859 is now Act 1273
2015-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-04-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-04-01HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-04-01HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-04-01HouseMotion to reconsider SB859 passed.
2015-04-01HouseRead the third time and failed.
2015-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-24HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-24HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-24SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-24SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-24SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-24SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-23SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-03-11SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-03-11SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-11SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-03-09SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback