AR SB854 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Digital Product And Motion Picture Industry Development Act Of 2009; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Digital Product And Motion Picture Industry Development Act Of 2009; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Sanders [R] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2015-03-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-03-19 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |