AR SB847 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Adopt A Right Of Access For Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Adopt A Right Of Access For Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-22HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-19SenateMotion was made for Immediate Consideration made by Senator Rice
2015-03-18SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-03-10SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-03-10SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-10SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-03-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback