AR SB845 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB845 is now Act 1501
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Arkansas Agriculture Department To Study The Benefits Of Entering Into Agricultural Exchanges With Other Countries; And To Require The Arkansas Agriculture Department To Report To The General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Arkansas Agriculture Department To Study The Benefits Of Entering Into Agricultural Exchanges With Other Countries; And To Require The Arkansas Agriculture Department To Report To The General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB845 is now Act 1501
2013-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-19SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2013-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-09SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-09HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2013-03-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
2013-03-07SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback